RI H7087 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt from the sales and use tax, on any goods and services provided to a disabled person with respect to a service, guide, or companion animal
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Finn [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7087.pdf |