RI H7084 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the director of DEM the authority to issue emergency refuse transfer licenses for temporary periods of time.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2016-03-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/25/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |