RI H7083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the twelve (12) member broadband council to create a plan to increase the use of broadband service in the state. A broadband administrator is to be designated in RI Commerce Corporation to access federal funds and coordinate with the council.
Title
The Rhode Island Broadband Development Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2022) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7083.pdf |