RI H7083 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that animal shelters meet certain specified conditions prior to euthanizing an animal.
Title
Animal Care
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7083.pdf |