RI H7079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that vehicles towed because of state or municipal laws be towed to a towing-storage facility closest to where the offense or accident occurred.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7079.pdf |