RI H7079 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Pupil Transportation Vehicles (would Authorize The School Committee Of Any City, Town Or Regional School District To Sell Advertising Space On School Buses, & To Negotiate With Private School Bus Carriers Regarding The Content Of Said Advertising.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Pupil Transportation Vehicles (would Authorize The School Committee Of Any City, Town Or Regional School District To Sell Advertising Space On School Buses, & To Negotiate With Private School Bus Carriers Regarding The Content Of Said Advertising.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7079.pdf |