RI H7078 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain provisions in the agreement forming the Exeter-West Greenwich School District regarding the required quorum to transact business, referenda for the District's annual budget and timing for the payment of apportioned costs.
Title
Relating To The Exeter-west Greenwich School District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-08-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2016) |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/27/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |