RI H7077 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents (individuals Seeking To Participate In Any Mentoring Prog. Whereby The Individual Would Be Working With Student(s) In A Mentoring Situation Would Be Required To Undergo A Criminal Background Check Similar To Other Employees In A Public Or Private School.)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents (individuals Seeking To Participate In Any Mentoring Prog. Whereby The Individual Would Be Working With Student(s) In A Mentoring Situation Would Be Required To Undergo A Criminal Background Check Similar To Other Employees In A Public Or Private School.)
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-07 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | House read and passed | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on House Calendar (02/15/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-01-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7077.pdf |