RI H7066 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts the use of a victim's gender or sexual orientation as a defense by any defendant claiming provocation, diminished capacity or self-defense and prohibits the court from allowing such information into evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Trials (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-22HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/22/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-01-30HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback