RI H7066 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the provisions of the general laws relating to the state car tax in order that the assessment of used motor vehicles be based on the average trade-in price, rather than retail price and would also extend the appeal period from 30 to 45 days.
Title
Motor Vehicle And Trailer Excise Tax Elimination Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |