RI H7066 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Regulation Of Sales (would Allow Holders Of Class A Liquor Licenses To Remain Open On Sundays Until 9:00 P.m. If The Following Monday Is A Holiday.)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages - Regulation Of Sales (would Allow Holders Of Class A Liquor Licenses To Remain Open On Sundays Until 9:00 P.m. If The Following Monday Is A Holiday.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Richard Morrison [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2012-05-17 | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-15 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2012) | |
2012-05-09 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | |
2012-03-01 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on House Calendar (03/01/2012) | |
2012-02-28 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2012) | |
2012-02-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7066.pdf |