RI H7065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- HOTELS - Requires online posting of hotel rules and expand the authority of the innkeeper to eject a person for being verbally abusive or physically threatening to an employee or hotel guest.
Title
Requires online posting of hotel rules and expand the authority of the innkeeper to eject a person for being verbally abusive or physically threatening to an employee or hotel guest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7065.pdf |