RI H7065 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Dr. Victor Pedro and Ann Allen to join Mary G. Basler and Joseph J. Reale, Jr., in marriage on or about June 30, 2018, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-03-01HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-01SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/01/2018)
2018-02-27SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHouse read and passed
2018-01-26HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (01/30/2018)
2018-01-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-01-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2018)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback