RI H7063 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island American Indian Affairs commission.
Title
The Rhode Island American Indian Affairs Commission Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7063.pdf |