RI H7039 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers to disclose in writing that a vehicle being sold has a spare tire/ jack or is otherwise equipped in compliance with applicable law. There shall be a civil penalty of $100 for a violation under this section.
Title
Dealerships
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |