RI H7038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow The Honorable Scott Avedisian To Join Christina Marie Finn And Sean Patrick Woodbine In Marriage On Or About August 25, 2012, Within The City Of Warwick, Rhode Island.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow The Honorable Scott Avedisian To Join Christina Marie Finn And Sean Patrick Woodbine In Marriage On Or About August 25, 2012, Within The City Of Warwick, Rhode Island.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-01 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/01/2012) | |
2012-02-09 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | House read and passed | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on House Calendar (01/17/2012) | |
2012-01-11 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-01-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/11/2012) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7038.pdf |