RI H7034 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the department of children, youth and families to process nationwide criminal record checks.
Title
National Criminal Records Check
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |