RI H7033 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all candidates for office to file the same number of campaign finance reports, all due at the same times, whether or not they have or had a contested primary election.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/27/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7033.pdf |