RI H7032 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the city of Providence to grant a retailer's Class B license to property located on tax assessor's plat 43, lot 211
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | House read and passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/11/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2014) |
2014-01-21 | House | Meeting postponed (01/21/2014) |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |