RI H7029 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a petition for adoption, and if necessary, termination of parental rights, to be filed by a grandparent(s) without the noncustodial parents' consent, when the child is in the sole custody of the grandparent(s).
Title
Adoption Of Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-06-09 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |