RI H7026 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the notification requirements regarding the dismissal, suspension or lay-off of teachers in the event of a fiscal exigency or program reorganization.
Title
Teachers' Tenure
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2014) |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |