RI H7026 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance -- Motor Vehicle Damage Appraisers (would Permit The Insurance Commissioner To Grant Emergency Licenses To Permit Certain Experienced Motor Vehicle Appraisers To Act As Motor Vehicle Physical Damage Appraisers During Periods Of Emergency.)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance -- Motor Vehicle Damage Appraisers (would Permit The Insurance Commissioner To Grant Emergency Licenses To Permit Certain Experienced Motor Vehicle Appraisers To Act As Motor Vehicle Physical Damage Appraisers During Periods Of Emergency.)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-11 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | House read and passed | |
2012-01-17 | Placed on House Calendar (01/24/2012) | |
2012-01-17 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-01-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/17/2012) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7026.pdf |