RI H7021 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES - Provides that parents and guardians of children with disabilities in private school have the same rights and remedies as parents/guardians of children in public school.
Title
Provides that parents and guardians of children with disabilities in private school have the same rights and remedies as parents/guardians of children in public school.
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7021.pdf |