RI H7021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows emergency medical treatment to police dogs injured in the line of duty, which would include transporting by ambulance.
Title
Animal Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2022) |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |