RI H7021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Catherine Tobin to join Trevor Charles Horn and Jessica Elizabeth Simas-Morin in marriage on or about July 30, 2016, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | House read and passed |
2016-01-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (01/19/2016) |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/12/2016) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |