RI H7013 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- RYAN'S LAW - Overprescribing, death resulting, would result in three (3) year license suspension.
Title
Overprescribing, death resulting, would result in three (3) year license suspension.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage of Sub A (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-02-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/08/2024) |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-02-02 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/06/2024) |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2024) |
2024-01-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |