RI H7013 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Registration Of Vehicles (would Allow Members Of Ga To Retain His/her Private Registration Plates & Would Allow Him/her To Display Either Set Of Plates Upon A Properly Registered Motor Vehicle Owned By Him/her.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Registration Of Vehicles (would Allow Members Of Ga To Retain His/her Private Registration Plates & Would Allow Him/her To Display Either Set Of Plates Upon A Properly Registered Motor Vehicle Owned By Him/her.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2012) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7013.pdf |