RI H6618 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same as 21H-5118 -- Provides for an appropriation of state funds to cities and towns who are members of the Narragansett Bay marine task force (NBMTF) for the maintenance of boats providing services to Narragansett Bay.
Title
Payments To Fire Companies
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H6618.pdf |