RI H6479 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Maryella Gainor to join Kaitlin Vann and Robert Gainor in marriage on or about August 29, 2021, within the Town of Charlestown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House read and passed |