RI H6428 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes technical amendments and corrections to the general laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Statutes And Statutory Construction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-08HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-06-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-30SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-06-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2021)
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-06-23HouseHouse read and passed
2021-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2021)
2021-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2021)
2021-06-18HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-06-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2021)
2021-06-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback