RI H6367 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits redevelopment agencies to finance the construction of projects for residential, recreational, commercial, industrial, institutional, public, or other purposes contemplated by a redevelopment plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redevelopment Agencies And Projects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-18HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-10-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-09-29HouseScheduled for hearing (10/18/2017)
2017-09-29HouseScheduled for hearing (10/10/2017)
2017-06-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback