RI H6338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the state be solely responsible for the costs of students enrolled in career and technical education (CTE) and vocational programs outside their district.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act -- Career And Technical Education Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6338.pdf |