RI H6335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows The Honorable John M. Xifaras to join Sarah J. Lang and Scott Levy in marriage on or about July 15, 2017, within the Town of Bristol, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | House read and passed |