RI H6325 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a charter public school that operates or will operate elementary school grades, middle school grades or high school grades shall be considered a network charter school notwithstanding the facility or the administration of the school.
Title
Establishment Of Public Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |