RI H6323 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - House passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the sealing of court files in residential eviction proceedings upon the filing of a motion.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2023-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-12 | House | Meeting postponed (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-12 | House | Meeting postponed (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |