RI H6314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a pound or animal shelter to put an animal up for adoption after ten (10) days if it has a tag or after five (5) days if it has no tag.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A as amended |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Meeting postponed (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |