RI H6308 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an automated external defibrillator (AED) and qualified person to administer an AED at all public places capable of holding three hundred (300) people or more.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators Required
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Rep. David Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |