RI H6300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the I-195 commission to conduct training for new commission members which would include training in ethics.
Title
The I-195 Redevelopment Act Of 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |