RI H6293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Each individual violating law governing electricians, plumbers, and other trades constitutes a separate offense for firms/corporations.
Title
Electricians - Trades Licensing - Penalty For Violations
Sponsors
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |