RI H6280 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires commercial landlords to review and inspect the necessary licenses of barbers and hairdressers, who seek to rent their premises and increases the penalties for license violations.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists, And Estheticians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee continued |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |