RI H6279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Require The Expiration Of The Issuance Of Any Special Motor Vehicle Registration Plate Which Fails To Meet The Statutorily Mandated Minimum Number Of Prepaid Orders Within Five (5) Years After The Enactment Authorizing The Plates Issuance.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Registration Of Vehicles (would Require The Expiration Of The Issuance Of Any Special Motor Vehicle Registration Plate Which Fails To Meet The Statutorily Mandated Minimum Number Of Prepaid Orders Within Five (5) Years After The Enactment Authorizing The Plates Issuance.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6279.pdf |