RI H6245 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Providence Country Day School a Rhode Island nonprofit corporation, located in East Providence, Rhode Island, effective as of December 31, 2011.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6245.pdf |