RI H6240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits amount of bail that may be forfeited upon defendant’s violation of terms of bail, to amount set as surety and prevent Attorney General from filing a petition to forfeit bail until 45 days after entry of arrest warrant into court’s database.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-06-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-05-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |