RI H6237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Education (ride) To Study The Impact, Outcome, And Needs Of Youths With One Or Both Parents Incarcerated
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Education (ride) To Study The Impact, Outcome, And Needs Of Youths With One Or Both Parents Incarcerated
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6237.pdf |