RI H6236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitate locally administered retirement plans in Central Falls joining municipal employees retirement system.
Title
Retirement Of Municipal Employees And Closed Municipal Retirement Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |