RI H6222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides state aid to municipalities in the amount of thirty-nine million dollars ($39,000,000) based on population and increased annually by the increase in the consumer price index (CPI).
Title
State Aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2023) |
2023-04-23 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/26/2023) |
2023-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6222.pdf |