RI H6213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the grounds on which the DMV may refuse registration for failure to pay a fine to include, interest, penalties, or other monetary amount. Requires the municipality that requests the denial to add and forward an additional $5 fee to the DMV.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage *************************** (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |