RI H6207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This act makes a number of technical amendments to the general laws, prepared at the recommendation of the Law Revision Office. Article I contains the reenactment of title 5 of the general laws. Article II includes the statutory construction provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Statutes And Statutory Construction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019)
2019-06-27SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-06-27HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-25HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback