RI H6192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts both the land and building of the Stadium Theatre Performing Arts Centre in Woonsocket and as identified by street address and plat and lot number.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-05-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6192.pdf |