RI H6189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces age from 25 to 18.
Title
Adoption Of Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2021) |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |